+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7149b
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 7149a
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.662
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
+ − Vote
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1