+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.133
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor