+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.198
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.457
- Substituted For A2125a
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7132a
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.793
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor