+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 7085a
- Amend and recommit to rules
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1165
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Vote
June 3, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - Jun 3, 2014
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: nay
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor