+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 705a
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.230
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.487
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
May 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor