+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1187
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor