+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.523
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1585
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
February 15, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 9
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
June 7, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21