+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.370
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.483
- Substituted For A8846
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.284
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor