+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.9
- Signed Chap.420
On October 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.820
- Substituted For A9415
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1736
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1