+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.126
On December 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.490
- Substituted For A10029
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1432
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6980b
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6980a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 17, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7