+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.88
On December 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.624
- Substituted For A7727
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1582
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 7, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor