+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a8921
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1084
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to children and families
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - Jun 2, 2014
- Yeas: 37
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Children and Families - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: nay
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor