+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.116
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.877
- Substituted For A8803a
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6960a
On February 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.282
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
February 5, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor