+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.667
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 6958a
- Amend (t) and recommit to energy and telecommunications
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Vote
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
Details:
+
−
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: present
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea