+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6952a
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.213
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
January 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19