+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.279
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
January 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor