+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9303b
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1629
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6943a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1