+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.13
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.342
- Substituted For A8986
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.15
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 13, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 9, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor