+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1064
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor