+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.194
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.62
- Substituted For A8676a
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1324
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6929a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor