+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.368
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor