+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.272
On October 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.74
- Substituted For A8643
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.698
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
June 8, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor