+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.304
On December 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.543
- Substituted For A10136
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.722
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1