+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.318
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.186
- Substituted For A9674b
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6884b
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6884a
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1009
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor