+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.956
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor