+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.334
On October 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.322
- Substituted For A9069a
On March 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.654
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6850b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6850a
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On August 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor