+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a9103
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.439
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Vote
April 29, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Higher Education - Apr 29, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor