+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.435
On November 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.68
- Substituted For A9349
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.400
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor