+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7817
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.729
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Vote
May 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor