+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a9732
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1001
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to children and families
+ − Vote
May 28, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Children and Families - May 28, 2014
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor