+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.242
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.635
- Substituted For A8491
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2112
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor