+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6767b
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6767a
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.673
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor