+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.333
On October 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.229
- Substituted For A9985
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.600
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6756a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2105
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 11
June 20, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor