+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2104
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor