+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7981
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.70
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1572
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
January 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 10
June 7, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor