+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.537
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7