+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a8819
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.608
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
+ − Vote
May 12, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Corporations, Authorities and Commissions - May 12, 2014
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor