+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.659
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2186
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
June 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor