+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.160
On August 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.80
- Substituted For A8827
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.556
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor