+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A5370a
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.605
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor