+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.329
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.629
- Substituted For A8310
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1935
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor