+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.447
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 6689a
- Amend and recommit to local government
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Vote
April 29, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - Apr 29, 2014
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor