+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6669a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.656
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 6
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2