+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1942
- Referred To Rules
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6664a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2082
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
June 19, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor