+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A6987a
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.478
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor