+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1398
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2