+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.484
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6656a
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor