+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.315
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On August 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
January 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7