+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.477
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On August 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7