+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1578
On June 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6651a
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor